This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 08:23:19 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, successor by merger to LaSalle Bank National Association, as Trustee for Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates WMAL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 U S Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, successor by merger to LaSalle Bank National Association, as Trustee for Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates WMAL was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, successor by merger to LaSalle Bank National Association, as Trustee for Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates WMAL

Defendants

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as nominee for GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as nominee for Bank of America, N.A., successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP

Luvia Gonzalez

John Doe #1 through #6, and Jane Doe #1 through #6, the last twelve names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien up

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Not Yet Classified

BUCKLEY MADOLE, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ROGERS, HEATHER C

Attorney at DAVIDSON, FINK, LLP

DAGOUNIS, MARIKA DENISE

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISMISSAL *Corrected* CANCELLING NOTICE OF PENDENCY

ORDER - DISMISSAL *Corrected* CANCELLING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

NOTICE NOTICE TO DISCONTINUE SETTLED ACTION AND VACATE LIS PENDENS

NOTICE NOTICE TO DISCONTINUE SETTLED ACTION AND VACATE LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AS NOMINEE FOR GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING, INC. - A ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AS NOMINEE FOR GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING, INC. - A ... show more; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

AFFIDAVIT LUVIA GONZALEZ - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT LUVIA GONZALEZ - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LUVIA GONZALEZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LUVIA GONZALEZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - GONZALEZ

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - GONZALEZ; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL *Corrected* CANCELLING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE TO DISCONTINUE SETTLED ACTION AND VACATE LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AS NOMINEE FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP F/K/A COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING LP - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AS NOMINEE FOR GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING, INC. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT LUVIA GONZALEZ - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LUVIA GONZALEZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - GONZALEZ; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dagounis, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less