This case was last updated from Queens County Courts on 02/25/2023 at 05:45:39 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2021-1 v. Skyline Contracting & Maintenance Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 U S Bank National Association, as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2021-1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Skyline Contracting Maintenance Corp. This case was filed in Queens County Courts, Queens County Supreme Court Civil Term - 1 located in Greene, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Denis Butler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Queens, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Denis Butler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2021-1

Defendants

Skyline Contracting & Maintenance Corp.

Clement Armogan

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

New York City Department of Finance

John Doe #1- #50

Mary Roe #1- #50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Payment History

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Payment History; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) POA

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) POA; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLEMENT ARMOGAN 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLEMENT ARMOGAN 3215; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/24/2023; Received: 01/24/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLEMENT ARMOGAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLEMENT ARMOGAN; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/24/2023; Received: 01/24/2023

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - G Guaranty

EXHIBIT(S) - G Guaranty; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Payment History; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) POA; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLEMENT ARMOGAN 3215; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/24/2023; Received: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLEMENT ARMOGAN; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/24/2023; Received: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of first legals on Guarantor; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/18/2023; Received: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SKYLINIE CONTRACTING & MAINTENANCE CORP; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/05/2023; Received: 01/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Guaranty; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less