This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 05/20/2020 at 02:48:27 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF ABFC 2007-WMC1 TRUST ASSET BACKED FUNDING CORPORATION ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-WMC1 v. CANDY S. MANES et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF ABFC 2007-WMC1 TRUST ASSET BACKED FUNDING CORPORATION ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-WMC1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CANDY S MANES. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles N Zambito. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7170

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Charles N Zambito

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NA, TR

Defendants

Candy S Manes A/K/A CANDY MANES A/K/A CANDY S. KASTELIE

Chris L Manes

Chris Manes

Candy S Kastelie

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

Candy Manes A/K/A CHRIS MANES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DI CARO, JOHN A

LEOPOLD, SAUL O

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - B Schedule B - Notices of Appearance And/Or Answers

EXHIBIT(S) - B Schedule B - Notices of Appearance And/Or Answers; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A - Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A - Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Stipulation Canceling Lis Pendens with Attorney Affirmation

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Stipulation Canceling Lis Pendens with Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail for Notice of Mortgage Servicer Change

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail for Notice of Mortgage Servicer Change; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE

NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT 1304 AOS

AFFIDAVIT 1304 AOS; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

AFFIRMATION 1304 Affirmation

AFFIRMATION 1304 Affirmation; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Leopold, S. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MERRICK BANK CORPORATION; Filed By: Leopold, S. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Schedule B - Notices of Appearance And/Or Answers; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A - Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Stipulation Canceling Lis Pendens with Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail for Notice of Mortgage Servicer Change; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT; Filed By: Leopold, S. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHRIS L MANES; Filed By: Leopold, S. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1304 AOS; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION 1304 Affirmation; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Leopold, S. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MERRICK BANK CORPORATION; Filed By: Leopold, S. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Leopold, S.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less