This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:44:35 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR LEHMAN XS TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-10N - v. - JANICE GOODHUE et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR LEHMAN XS TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-10N filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JANICE GOODHUE. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR LEHMAN XS TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-10N

Defendants

CIT BANK, N.A. F/K/A ONEWEST BANK, N.A., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO INDYMAC BANK, F.S.B.

Janice Goodhue A/K/A JANICE M. GOODHUE

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF RIVER HILL CONDOMINIUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

LAGUMINA, JOHN J

Attorney at THE LAGUMINA LAW FIRM PLLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #2) ORDER PURSUANT TO CPLR 3408

EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #2) ORDER PURSUANT TO CPLR 3408; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #2) NOTICE OF APPERANCE

EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #2) NOTICE OF APPERANCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #2) POWER OF ATTORNEY

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #2) POWER OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) ATTORNEY FEE AFFIRMATION

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) ATTORNEY FEE AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ CIT BANK, NA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ CIT BANK, NA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF RIVER HILL CONDOMINIUM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF RIVER HILL CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lagumina, J.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lagumina, J.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #2) ORDER PURSUANT TO CPLR 3408; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #2) NOTICE OF APPERANCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #2) POWER OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) ATTORNEY FEE AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #2) REFEREE'S OATH AND REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ CIT BANK, NA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF RIVER HILL CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lagumina, J.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lagumina, J.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less