This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:54:28 (UTC).

US Bank National Association as Trustee for CRMSI REMIC Series 2006-02 - REMIC Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-02 - v. - Maria Otero et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 US Bank National Association as Trustee for CRMSI REMIC Series 2006-02 - REMIC Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-02 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Maria Otero. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association as Trustee for CRMSI REMIC Series 2006-02 - REMIC Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-02

Defendants

New York City Parking Violations Bureau

John Doe (REFUSED NAME)

Maria Otero

New York City Environmental Control Board

Criminal Court of the City of New York

Jane Doe (REFUSED NAME)

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau

Ivan Rivera

Not Yet Classified

Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ZEGARELLI, THOMAS MATTHEW

Attorney at Frenkel, Lambert, Weiss, Weisman, & Gordon, LLP

FALASCO, TODD C

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON

FEMMINELLA, NICOLE P

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON, LLP

Bolduc, Kristin Marie

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 19, 2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 19, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002)

ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

OATH (Motion #002) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

OATH (Motion #002) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #002); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NY; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 19, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH (Motion #002) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #002); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - s (Motion #002) loan modification Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NY; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NYC ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less