This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 15:19:24 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CIM TRUST 2016-1, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2016-1 - v. - HEATHER B. WELFARE et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CIM TRUST 2016-1, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2016-1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HEATHER B WELFARE. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

Heather Welfare AND JANE DOES, SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, PARTIES INTENDED BEING POSSIBLE TENANTS OR OCCUPANTS OF PREMISES, AND CORPORATIONS, OTHER ENTITIES OR PERSONS WHO CLAIM, OR MAY CLAIM, A LIEN AGAINST THE PREMISES

Heather B Welfare A/K/A HEATHER WELFARE

Brian Hallows

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIERER, CYNTHIA ANNE

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT- 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT- 1303; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRIAN HALLOWS S/H/A JD 1- 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRIAN HALLOWS S/H/A JD 1- 1303; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRIAN HOLLOWS S/H/A JD1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRIAN HOLLOWS S/H/A JD1; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER B. WELFARE- 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER B. WELFARE- 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER B. WELFARE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER B. WELFARE; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT- 1303; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRIAN HALLOWS S/H/A JD 1- 1303; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRIAN HOLLOWS S/H/A JD1; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER B. WELFARE- 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER B. WELFARE; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less