This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 20:49:09 (UTC).

Upstate Associates - v. - City of Niagara Falls

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 Upstate Associates filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against City of Niagara Falls. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Upstate Associates

Defendant

City of Niagara Falls

Not Yet Classified

County of Niagara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINMANN, PETER ALLEN

Attorney at Wolfgang & Weinmann

Defendant Attorney

ODONNELL, THOMAS MICHAEL

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LISOWSKI, GARY HENRY

Attorney at NIAGARA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER signed

ORDER - OTHER signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Hearing Minute Sheet

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Hearing Minute Sheet; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

ANSWER Answer to Petition

ANSWER Answer to Petition; Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY Consent Order to Intervene

NOTICE OF ENTRY Consent Order to Intervene; Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) signed and granted

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) signed and granted; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #2)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion to Intervene

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion to Intervene; Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/22/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/22/2017

PETITION *Corrected*

PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/22/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Hearing Minute Sheet; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Petition; Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Consent Order to Intervene; Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) signed and granted; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion to Intervene; Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Lisowski, G.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less