This case was last updated from Wayne County Courts on 11/21/2020 at 10:00:30 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC V MICHELE L LAMORA

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHELE L LAMORA. This case was filed in Wayne County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6295

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wayne, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

Michele L Lamora

Wolcott, NY 14590

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-MICHELE L LAMORA-46138303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-MICHELE L LAMORA-46138303; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 10/30/2020; Received: 10/30/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MICHELE L LAMORA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MICHELE L LAMORA; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Sinnott, T.; Filed: 10/22/2020; Received: 10/22/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Sinnott, T.; Filed: 10/22/2020; Received: 10/22/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-MICHELE L LAMORA-46138303; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 10/30/2020; Received: 10/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MICHELE L LAMORA; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Sinnott, T.; Filed: 10/22/2020; Received: 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by Sinnott, T.; Filed: 10/22/2020; Received: 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less