This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/15/2020 at 14:38:08 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC - v. - DAWNMARIE DOLAND

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAWNMARIE DOLAND. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2732

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

Dawnmarie Doland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

ROONEY, TIMOTHY F

Attorney at MULLOLLY JEFFREY ROONEY & FLYNN

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE letter to def re: new court date

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE letter to def re: new court date; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Updated Conference Adjournment Letter to Defendant and Affidavit of Service

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Updated Conference Adjournment Letter to Defendant and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/22/2019; Received: 06/22/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE **Corrected** Notice of Status Conference to Defendant

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE **Corrected** Notice of Status Conference to Defendant; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/22/2019; Received: 06/22/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/22/2019; Received: 06/22/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for PC Request & Affirmation of Good Faith, Blueback for RJI, PC Request & Aff. of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for PC Request & Affirmation of Good Faith, Blueback for RJI, PC Request & Aff. of Good Faith; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for RJI; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING AS ENTERED BY COUNTY CLERK

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING AS ENTERED BY COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DAWNMARIE DOLAND

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DAWNMARIE DOLAND; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAWNMARIE DOLAND

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAWNMARIE DOLAND; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE letter to def re: new court date; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Updated Conference Adjournment Letter to Defendant and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/22/2019; Received: 06/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE **Corrected** Notice of Status Conference to Defendant; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/22/2019; Received: 06/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/22/2019; Received: 06/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO DEFENDANT RE: COMPLIANCE CONF; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2018; Received: 11/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for PC Request & Affirmation of Good Faith, Blueback for RJI, PC Request & Aff. of Good Faith; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for RJI; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING AS ENTERED BY COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DAWNMARIE DOLAND; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAWNMARIE DOLAND; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less