This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 15:01:46 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC v. AARON K BASSAGE

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against AARON K BASSAGE. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Ontario County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

Aaron K Bassage

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 bank statement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 bank statement; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

DEFECT CHECKLIST

DEFECT CHECKLIST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AARON K BASSAGE

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AARON K BASSAGE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 bank statement; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFECT CHECKLIST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT AARON K BASSAGE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less