This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 05/20/2020 at 14:06:29 (UTC).

Unifirst Corporation Location #051 v. New York Auto Sales & Repairs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 Unifirst Corporation Location 051 filed an Other lawsuit against New York Auto Sales Repairs, Inc. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Anthony J Paris. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Anthony J Paris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifirst Corporation Location #051

Defendant

New York Auto Sales & Repairs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOYD, JOHN F.

Attorney at BOND, SCHOENECK & KING, PLLC

REYNOLDS, TAYLOR ELISE SHUPERT

Attorney at Bond Schoeneck & King

WRIGHT, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at BOND, SCHOENECK & KING, PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Copy of Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Copy of Order; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) CONTEMPT ORDER

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) CONTEMPT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Arrest Warrant

EXHIBIT(S) - B Arrest Warrant; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Question & Answer Form

EXHIBIT(S) - A Question & Answer Form; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Motion

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Motion; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Information Subpoena and affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Information Subpoena and affidavit of service; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on NY Auto

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on NY Auto; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/18/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judge Paris' Motion Rules - Rtn Dt 2/20/19

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judge Paris' Motion Rules - Rtn Dt 2/20/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/12/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER Confirm Arbitration Award and Judgment

RJI -RE: OTHER Confirm Arbitration Award and Judgment; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Online Filing Acknowledgement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Online Filing Acknowledgement; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Agreement; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Final Arbitration Award

EXHIBIT(S) - A Final Arbitration Award; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Copy of Order; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) CONTEMPT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Arrest Warrant; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Question & Answer Form; Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Reynolds, T.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Motion; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Information Subpoena and affidavit of service; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on NY Auto; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/18/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judge Paris' Motion Rules - Rtn Dt 2/20/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Confirm Arbitration Award and Judgment; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Online Filing Acknowledgement; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Agreement; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Final Arbitration Award; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Boyd, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less