This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 17:06:01 (UTC).

ULSTER SAVINGS BANK v. JOHN A. MARSHALL et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 ULSTER SAVINGS BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHN A MARSHALL. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ULSTER SAVINGS BANK

Defendants

Gail F. Marshall

JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5 said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises being foreclose

BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOUNT KISCO CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

John A. Marshall

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

TABAKIN, GREGG P

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH, KAHN & SHEPARD, P.C.

SEBASTIAN, SIMONE AMANDA PERSAUD

Attorney at FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

SINGLETON, WHITNEY W.

Attorney at SINGLETON, DAVIS & SINGLETON, PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Singleton, W.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Singleton, W.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C EXHIBITS FOR THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C EXHIBITS FOR THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF MAILING; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SARAH

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SARAH; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT JOHN A. MARSHALL - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT JOHN A. MARSHALL - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN A. MARSHALL - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN A. MARSHALL - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOUNT KISCO CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION - AFFIDAVIT OF SUPPLEMENTAL MAILI ... show more

AFFIDAVIT BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOUNT KISCO CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION - AFFIDAVIT OF SUPPLEMENTAL MAILI ... show more; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOUNT KISCO CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION - SECRETARY OF STATE - AFFIDAVIT ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOUNT KISCO CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION - SECRETARY OF STATE - AFFIDAVIT ... show more; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Singleton, W.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Singleton, W.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-C EXHIBITS FOR THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF MAILING; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SARAH; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A SARAH MARSHALL - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GAIL F. MARSHALL - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JOHN A. MARSHALL - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN A. MARSHALL - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOUNT KISCO CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION - AFFIDAVIT OF SUPPLEMENTAL MAILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOUNT KISCO CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION - SECRETARY OF STATE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less