This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:42:27 (UTC).

TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORPORATION - v. - LUIS E PEREZ

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUIS E PEREZ. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORPORATION

Defendant

Luis E Perez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service file number 1155883

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service file number 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1155883

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1155883

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1155883

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1155883

AFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service file number 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1155883; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less