This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:38:00 (UTC).

Townhouse Operating Co., LLC - v. - Thane Matthews

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 Townhouse Operating Co , LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thane Matthews. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Townhouse Operating Co., LLC d/b/a Townhouse Center for Rehabilitation & Nursing

Defendant and Not Yet Classified

Thane Matthews

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

NEUMAN, JEFFREY ROBERT

Attorney at Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara, Wolf & Carone, LLP

Defendant Attorney

FREUNDLICH, JORDAN M.

Attorney at VISHNICK MCGOVERN MILIZIO LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS reg mail on atty 11 28 18

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS Certif Mail RRR and Reg Mail on client Thane Matthews 11 28 18

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOE of Amend Short Form Order and Short Form Order 11 28 18

ORDER - AMENDED

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Including affidavit of service

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS Verif Ans

ANSWER

Verified Answer

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Neuman, J.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AOS reg mail on atty 11 28 18; Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AOS Certif Mail RRR and Reg Mail on client Thane Matthews 11 28 18; Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) NOE of Amend Short Form Order and Short Form Order 11 28 18; Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Including affidavit of service; Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exh B - Email Notification of Proposed OSC; Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Neuman, J.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Neuman, J.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Neuman, J.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Verif Ans; Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Freundlich, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Neuman, J. - filed by Maverick Process Serving; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Neuman, J. - filed by Maverick Process Serving; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Neuman, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less