This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 10/25/2020 at 06:22:34 (UTC).

Town of Niagara Farmland Conservatory v. George Dewperkash Mannoe et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Town of Niagara Farmland Conservatory filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against George Dewperkash Mannoe. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank Caruso. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank Caruso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Town of Niagara Farmland Conservatory

Defendants

Sarita Mannoe

Reinier Walter-paul Schaper

George Dewperkash Mannoe

Dewkoemarie Schaper-mannoe

Humprey Tj Mannoe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAFARELLA, JASON J

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SARITA MANNOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SARITA MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE REINIER WALTER-PAUL SCHAPER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE REINIER WALTER-PAUL SCHAPER; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HUMPREY T.J. MANNOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HUMPREY T.J. MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEORGE DEWPERKASH MANNOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEORGE DEWPERKASH MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DEWKOEMARIE SCHAPER-MANNOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DEWKOEMARIE SCHAPER-MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1)

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice and Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice and Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1); Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SARITA MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE REINIER WALTER-PAUL SCHAPER; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HUMPREY T.J. MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEORGE DEWPERKASH MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DEWKOEMARIE SCHAPER-MANNOE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice and Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1); Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Cafarella, J.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less