This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:20:13 (UTC).

TOWER DBW V TRUST 2015-1, - v. - LAWRENCE J. KLEIN JR. et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 TOWER DBW filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against TRUST 2015-1. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0570

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWER DBW V TRUST 2015-1,

Defendants

Lawrence J. Klein JR.

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

ST. PIUS X CHURCH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION;

CITIZENS BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION F/K/A RBS CITIZENS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #100,

Not Yet Classified

Frontier Abstract

All New York Process Servers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

IACCHETTA, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ROACH, MARY KEEFE

Attorney at OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

FLEMING, MARY ENRIGHT

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FEDERAL CENTRE

SHERER, JOSHUA ALAN

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

MODICA, TYNE REGINA

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

JUDGMENT - VACATED

JUDGMENT - VACATED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER Discontinues action

ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER Discontinues action; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Referee's Consent

EXHIBIT(S) - D Referee's Consent; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - C Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency and Discontinuance of Action

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency and Discontinuance of Action; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Roach, M.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - VACATED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER Discontinues action; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Referee's Consent; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency and Discontinuance of Action; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) order vacating judgment of foreclosure and sale, discontinuing action and canceling notices of pendency; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Modica, T. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Roach, M.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less