This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 18:09:33 (UTC).

TOWER DBW V TRUST 2015-1 - v. - EARL R. STORRS III et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 TOWER DBW filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against TRUST 2015-1. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0553

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWER DBW V TRUST 2015-1

Defendants

Timothy J. Storrs

BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FIA CARD SERVICES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Earl R. Storrs III INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF DEBRA A. STORRS, DECEASED

CHASE BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

AND JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #100

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

LVNV FUNDING LLC APO HOUSEHOLD BANK (SB), NA

SYNCHRONY BANK F/K/A GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK F/K/A GE MONEY BANK

Not Yet Classified

All New York Process Servers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

Defendant Attorney

Storrs, Earl

Not Yet Classified Attorney

IACCHETTA, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service with FYI LTR

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service with FYI LTR; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Order granting permission to schedule the foreclosure sale and other relief

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Order granting permission to schedule the foreclosure sale and other relief; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion for an order granting permission to schedule the foreclosure sale and other relief

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion for an order granting permission to schedule the foreclosure sale and other relief; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale with Affidavit of Service by Mail

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale with Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Correspondence

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Correspondence; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service with FYI LTR; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Order granting permission to schedule the foreclosure sale and other relief; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion for an order granting permission to schedule the foreclosure sale and other relief; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale with Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Correspondence; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Referee's Oath & Report of Amount Due; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less