This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 21:03:41 (UTC).

TOMMY DIAZ v. BP ASSETS 82 LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 TOMMY DIAZ filed an Other lawsuit against BP ASSETS 82 LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilma Guzman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Wilma Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tommy Diaz

Defendants

PARKOFF MANAGEMENT CO.,

ADAM L. PARKOFF, PLLC,

PARKOFF OPERATING CORP

BP ASSETS 82 LLC,

THE PARKOFF ORGANIZATION,

PARKOFF LENOX HILL REALTY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO, ADAM L.

Attorney at ADAM L. SHAPIRO & ASSOCATES, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

MALANG, ELIZABETH E

Attorney at RYAN & CONLON, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED JULY 25,2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED JULY 25,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 07/25/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

ANSWER (AMENDED) Corrected Answer

ANSWER (AMENDED) Corrected Answer; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED JULY 25,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 07/25/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Corrected Answer; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less