This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 06/02/2023 at 06:37:39 (UTC).

Timothy E Demler v. Niagara County Independence Party et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Timothy E Demler filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Niagara County Independence Party. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank Caruso. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2010

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank Caruso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy E Demler

Defendants

Michael Tucker

Gilbert Doucet

Robert Cliffe

Jillian Nemi

Pauline Evans

Elizabeth Ceretto

Patti Weiss

Arthur Gerbec

Larry Helwig

Marilyn Panosian

David Macneil

Matthew Stolzenfels

Terry Mcintyre

Niagara County Independence Party

James Heur

Eileen Koszlek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, STEVEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

PRETSCH, MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 03/04/2021; Received: 03/04/2021

NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 03/04/2021; Received: 03/04/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #3)

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #2)

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 01/21/2021; Received: 01/21/2021

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #2)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Bauerle, A.; Filed: 01/14/2021; Received: 01/14/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MOTION NOTE OF ISSUE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MOTION NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 12/07/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/07/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CLERKS MINUTES

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CLERKS MINUTES; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/18/2015; Received: 12/07/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2014; Received: 12/07/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SCHEDULING ORDER/CARUSO

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SCHEDULING ORDER/CARUSO; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2013; Received: 12/07/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2013; Received: 12/07/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY FOR PLNTF TO CHIACCHIA & FLEMING LLP

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY FOR PLNTF TO CHIACCHIA & FLEMING LLP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2013; Received: 12/07/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT NOT SUM CERTAIN

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT NOT SUM CERTAIN; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2010; Received: 12/07/2020

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2010; Received: 12/07/2020

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 03/04/2021; Received: 03/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 03/04/2021; Received: 03/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 01/21/2021; Received: 01/21/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Pretsch, M.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Bauerle, A.; Filed: 01/14/2021; Received: 01/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2); Filed By: Bauerle, A.; Filed: 01/14/2021; Received: 01/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION/STEVEN M COHEN ESQ; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MOTION NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/26/2018
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2015
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CLERKS MINUTES; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/18/2015; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2014; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2013
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SCHEDULING ORDER/CARUSO; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2013; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2013
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2013; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2013
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY FOR PLNTF TO CHIACCHIA & FLEMING LLP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2013; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT NOT SUM CERTAIN; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2010; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2010
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2010; Received: 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less