This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 17:14:49 (UTC).

TIMOTHY C. GRANT - v. - ACADEMY FIRE LIFE SAFETY, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 TIMOTHY C GRANT filed an Other lawsuit against ACADEMY FIRE LIFE SAFETY, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy C. Grant

Defendants

ACADEMY FIRE LIFE SAFETY, LLC

Ramilky R. Carrasco

Richard B. Grant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YADGAROV, MIKHAIL

Attorney at Mikhail Yadgarov & Associates, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

MOLOD, JULIE E

Attorney at MOLOD, SPITZ, DESANTIS PC

DESANTIS, SALVATORE J

Attorney at MOLOD SPITZ & DESANTIS, P.C.

WALSH, KATIE ANNE

SIMURO, ARTHUR

Attorney at Mendolia & Stenz

MUTARELLI, MICHAEL JAY

Attorney at James G. Bilello & Associates

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2); Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Notice of Withdrawal

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Notice of Withdrawal; Filed By: Walsh, K. - filed by Boehmesteve, K.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Woodburn, S.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Woodburn, S.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2); Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Notice of Withdrawal; Filed By: Walsh, K. - filed by Boehmesteve, K.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Woodburn, S.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Woodburn, S.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Yadgarov, M.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less