This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 08:56:08 (UTC).

TIG INSURANCE COMPANY et al - v. - ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 TIG INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert R Reed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert R Reed

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

successor by merger of AMERICAN SAFETY CASULTY INSURANCE COMPANY

TIG INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

EL-AD PROPERTIES NY LLC.

and WALTER GARCIA

CPS 1 REALTY GP LLC

ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CPS 1 REALTY LP

CPS 1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW, TODD SCOTT

Attorney at Gartner & Bloom

Defendant Attorneys

SHAPEY, ALAN M

Attorney at LIPSIG SHAPEY MANUS & MOVERMAN PC

HSIUNG, MARA

Attorney at The Law Office of Jeffrey Mathews

MATHEWS, JEFFREY A

Attorney at Law Offices of Jeffrey Mathews

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #005)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Fax

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Fax; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) Email

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) Email; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #005)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #005); Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) Email

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) Email; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #005) Stipulation

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #005) Stipulation; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #005) Decision and Order

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #005) Decision and Order; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #005) TIG's Opposition

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #005) TIG's Opposition; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THE EL-AD GROUP

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THE EL-AD GROUP; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR EL-AD PROPERTIES

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR EL-AD PROPERTIES; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPSI REALTY

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPSI REALTY; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPS 1 REALTY LP

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPS 1 REALTY LP; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPS 1 LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPS 1 LLC; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Memorandum decision

EXHIBIT(S) - A Memorandum decision; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Fax; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) Email; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #005); Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) Email; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #005) Stipulation; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #005) Decision and Order; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #005) TIG's Opposition; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #005) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Hsiung, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THE EL-AD GROUP; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR EL-AD PROPERTIES; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPSI REALTY; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPS 1 REALTY LP; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR CPS 1 LLC; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Memorandum decision; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, T. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less