This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:59:09 (UTC).

TIFFANY RUIZ-LOPEZ et al - v. - STEPHANIE RAMON et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 TIFFANY RUIZ-LOPEZ filed an Other lawsuit against STEPHANIE RAMON. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jennifer Ruiz

Tiffany Ruiz-lopez

Defendants

Stephanie Ramon

Daniel Aguilar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IKHILOV, Z. ERIK

Attorney at IKHILOV & ASSOCIATES

LILLING, RICHARD ALAN

Attorney at Milber Makris Plousadis & Seiden, LLP

Defendant Attorney

GIRIN, EUGENE

Attorney at JAMES G. BILELLO & ASSOCIATES - GEICO

 

Court Documents

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Girin, E. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Tiffany Ruiz-Lopez's Reply to Defendants' Counterclaims

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Tiffany Ruiz-Lopez's Reply to Defendants' Counterclaims; Filed By: Lilling, R.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Girin, E. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Girin, E. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lilling, R.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Girin, E. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lilling, R.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Tiffany Ruiz-Lopez's Reply to Defendants' Counterclaims; Filed By: Lilling, R.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Girin, E. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Girin, E. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less