This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 03/27/2020 at 16:10:44 (UTC).

Tiffany Oliva - v. - Maria Magnotti

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 Tiffany Oliva filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Maria Magnotti. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany Oliva

Defendant

Maria Magnotti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GHAZNAVI, FAIZAN UL-HAQ

DANAYEVA, AIGERIM

ELEFTERAKIS, NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorney

MAURER, GREGORY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Maurer, G. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Maurer, G. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ghaznavi, F.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Ghaznavi, F.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Ghaznavi, F.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Maurer, G. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Maurer, G. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ghaznavi, F.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Ghaznavi, F.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Ghaznavi, F.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHAZNAVI, FAIZAN UL-HAQ