This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 11/19/2021 at 00:48:32 (UTC).

Thomas M Rozboril v. Good Shepard Village at Endwell, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Thomas M Rozboril filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Good Shepard Village at Endwell, Inc . This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Oliver N Blaise Iii. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0360

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Oliver N Blaise Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF JULIA D. ROZBORIL

Thomas M Rozboril as Administrator of the Estate of Julia D. Rozboril

Defendants

Good Shepard Village at Endwell, Inc., d/b/a Good Shepard Village at Endwell

D/B/A GOOD SHEPARD VILLAGE AT ENDWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDLANDER, WILLIAM S

Attorney at FRIEDLANDER & MOSHER, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

COGHLAN, JOHN PATRICK

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

ROBINSON, LISA M

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

GERRIE, WESLEY LORNE

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service of Orders with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

ORDER - AMENDED

--none--

ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)

Corrected Amended Order

ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)

--none--

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Letters of Administration with Limitations

COMPLAINT

Complaint

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Acceptance of Service on behalf of GSV, Inc.

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Acceptance of Service on behalf of GSV, Inc.; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 03/09/2021; Received: 03/09/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for GSV - 14 Village Drive

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for GSV - 14 Village Drive; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 03/09/2021; Received: 03/09/2021

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Coghlan, J.; Filed: 02/24/2021; Received: 02/24/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Coghlan, J.; Filed: 02/24/2021; Received: 02/24/2021

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 02/16/2021; Received: 02/16/2021

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Orders with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 09/30/2021; Received: 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 09/30/2021; Received: 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Corrected Amended Order; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED); Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 09/24/2021; Received: 09/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 09/24/2021; Received: 09/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Robinson, L.; Filed: 09/21/2021; Received: 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2021; Received: 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Motion to Compromise; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 07/20/2021; Received: 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gerrie, W.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Robinson, L.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Letters of Administration with Limitations; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Acceptance of Service on behalf of GSV, Inc.; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 03/09/2021; Received: 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for GSV - 14 Village Drive; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 03/09/2021; Received: 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Coghlan, J.; Filed: 02/24/2021; Received: 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Coghlan, J.; Filed: 02/24/2021; Received: 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Friedlander, W.; Filed: 02/16/2021; Received: 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less