Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 05:16:52 (UTC).

THOMAS M HAAS - v. - AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 THOMAS M HAAS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC . This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah Chimes. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Deborah Chimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas M Haas and JUDITH HAAS

Defendants

DAP, INC

FMC CORPORATION,

CRANE CO.

PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

GARDNER DENVER, INC

GRINNELL LLC,

ITT LLC.,

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

BOGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

GOULD PUMPS LLC

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

CARRIER CORPORATION

MERGENTHALER LINOTYPE COMPANY

PLENCO,

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL),

ROGERS CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris, Inc.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COMERFORD, THOMAS M

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C

Defendant Attorneys

PEHUSH, TARA LYNNE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

FISHER, DAVID JONATHAN

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

CARNI, URIEL SHMAYA

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd.

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

HUTTNER, BRUCE S.

Attorney at DONOHUE, SABO, VARLEY & HUTTNER LLP

HAAG, SARAH RUTH

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

DIMARCO, ERIK CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

SQUITIERI, VIRGINIA PAULA

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

BELTZ, JORDAN DAVID

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

TESTA, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

Other Attorneys

Regev, Elissa

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

BROOKS, STEPHEN PHILIP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

BRIDGE, CHARLES CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

DWYER, ELIZABETH MEGHAN

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

LEONARDI, JENNIFER LYNN

Attorney at Barclay Damon LLP

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE as to Atwood & Morrill Co.

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE as to Atwood & Morrill Co.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

ORDER - DISMISSAL de: Rogers Corporation

ORDER - DISMISSAL de: Rogers Corporation; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ORDER - DISMISSAL de: Atwood & Morrill, Co., Inc.

ORDER - DISMISSAL de: Atwood & Morrill, Co., Inc.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Prop. OOD as to Rogers Corp.

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Prop. OOD as to Rogers Corp.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Prop. OOD as to Atwood & Morrill

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Prop. OOD as to Atwood & Morrill; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Notice of Entry of So-Ordered Court Filed Order of Dismissal as to defendant Gardner Denver

ORDER - DISMISSAL

de: Gardner Denver Inc.

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Crane Co. Only

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

Defendant Gardner Denver's Order of Dismissal

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

Union Carbide Corporation's Acknowledgement of Service

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

Georgia-Pacific LLC's Verified Answer and Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

--none--

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

--none--

ANSWER

Answer - Aurora Pump Company

ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER

Rogers Corporation's Answer

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

216 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOE as to Atwood & Morrill Co.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL de: Rogers Corporation; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL de: Atwood & Morrill, Co., Inc.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Prop. OOD as to Rogers Corp.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Prop. OOD as to Atwood & Morrill; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of So-Ordered Court Filed Order of Dismissal as to defendant Gardner Denver; Filed By: Dean, A.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL de: Gardner Denver Inc.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Crane Co. Only; Filed By: Pehush, T.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Defendant Gardner Denver's Order of Dismissal; Filed By: Dean, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter with E-Filed Stipulation of Discontinuance as to defendant Gardner Denver - request to so-order Order of Dismissal; Filed By: Dean, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Pfizer's Verified Answer; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation's Acknowledgement of Service; Filed By: Yavitz, J.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Georgia-Pacific LLC's Verified Answer and Cross-Claims; Filed By: Regev, E.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Squitieri, V.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Brandis, A.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Brandis, A.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer - Aurora Pump Company; Filed By: Haag, S.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Carni, U.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Rogers Corporation's Answer; Filed By: Testa, M.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Brandis, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less