This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:03:27 (UTC).

THOMAS KEARNS - v. - FRANCINE C. GELB et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 THOMAS KEARNS filed an Other lawsuit against FRANCINE C GELB. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Kearns

Defendants

Eric Gelb

Martin Gelb

Francine C. Gelb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBLATT, HELEN M.

Defendant Attorney

SCAHILL, FRANCIS J

Attorney at PICCIANO & SCAHILL, P.C.

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ERIC GELB

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ERIC GELB; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A-G (Motion #2) Pleadings, Discovery, Court Orders, Good faith letters

EXHIBIT(S) - A-G (Motion #2) Pleadings, Discovery, Court Orders, Good faith letters; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/03/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/03/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR MARTIN GELB

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR MARTIN GELB; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR FRANCINE C. GELB

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR FRANCINE C. GELB; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/03/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-G (Motion #2) Pleadings, Discovery, Court Orders, Good faith letters; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summon & Complaint; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR FRANCINE C. GELB; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR MARTIN GELB; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ERIC GELB; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less