This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 05/15/2023 at 13:14:40 (UTC).

THOMAS CARTWRIGHT et al v. SUFFOLK COUNTY COUNCIL, INC., BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 THOMAS CARTWRIGHT filed an Other lawsuit against SUFFOLK COUNTY COUNCIL, INC , BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Otsego, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Cartwright

Thomas Conigliari JR.

Gary Carlson

Defendants

SUFFOLK COUNTY COUNCIL, INC., BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAMBERG, DANIELLE H.

Defendant Attorney

BECKWITH, MATHEW WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lamberg, D.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lamberg, D.; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING FIFTH STIPULATION BY AND AMONG THE BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA, THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF SURVIVORS OF ABUSE AND THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS MODIFYING THE CONSENT ORDER GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING FIFTH STIPULATION BY AND AMONG THE BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA, THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF SURVIVORS OF ABUSE AND THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS MODIFYING THE CONSENT ORDER GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/16/2021; Received: 11/16/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/16/2021; Received: 11/16/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/16/2021; Received: 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/16/2021; Received: 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING FIFTH STIPULATION BY AND AMONG THE BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA, THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF SURVIVORS OF ABUSE AND THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS MODIFYING THE CONSENT ORDER GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lamberg, D.; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lamberg, D.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less