This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 07/12/2020 at 09:14:22 (UTC).

Thomas Amici et al v. David Wanagel et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Thomas Amici filed an Other lawsuit against David Wanagel. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph A. Mcbride. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0249

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph A. Mcbride

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joyce Amici

Thomas Amici

Heather Amici-vandemark

John Vandemark

Defendants

David Wanagel

Diane Wanagel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSSMORE, EDWARD Y

Attorney at EDWARD Y CROSSMORE ESQ

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, THOMAS PATRICK

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - I 2019 letter to Counsel

EXHIBIT(S) - I 2019 letter to Counsel; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H 2019 letter to Wanagel

EXHIBIT(S) - H 2019 letter to Wanagel; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G Report of Professional Engineer

EXHIBIT(S) - G Report of Professional Engineer; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F 2006 Amici Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - F 2006 Amici Affidavit; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Amici 2003 Map

EXHIBIT(S) - E Amici 2003 Map; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Amici 2003 Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - D Amici 2003 Deed; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Aerial Map

EXHIBIT(S) - C Aerial Map; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B 2007 Wanagel Map

EXHIBIT(S) - B 2007 Wanagel Map; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A 2007 Wanagel Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - A 2007 Wanagel Deed; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/26/2020; Received: 06/26/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/26/2020; Received: 06/26/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I 2019 letter to Counsel; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H 2019 letter to Wanagel; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Report of Professional Engineer; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F 2006 Amici Affidavit; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Amici 2003 Map; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Amici 2003 Deed; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Aerial Map; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B 2007 Wanagel Map; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A 2007 Wanagel Deed; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Respondent David Wanagel; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Affirmation of Attorney Thomas P. Smith; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/26/2020; Received: 06/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/26/2020; Received: 06/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less