This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 09/22/2022 at 05:57:10 (UTC).

The Village of Port Dickinson v. Barbara A. Waters

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 The Village of Port Dickinson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Barbara A Waters. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Tait. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2752

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Tait

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Village of Port Dickinson

Defendants

Barbara A. Waters a/k/a Barbara A. Plourd

Barbara a. Plourd A/k/a

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDDLETON, GINA MARIE

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2022; Received: 08/03/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 07/29/2022; Received: 07/29/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 07/29/2022; Received: 07/29/2022

ORDER - AMENDED Amended Preliminary Conference Order

ORDER - AMENDED Amended Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 07/17/2022; Received: 07/17/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/13/2022; Received: 06/13/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 06/13/2022; Received: 06/13/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/10/2022; Received: 06/10/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Discovery Requests/Questions

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Discovery Requests/Questions; Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 05/16/2022; Received: 05/16/2022

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Personal Service on Barbara Waters

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Personal Service on Barbara Waters; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 12/07/2021; Received: 12/07/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2021; Received: 12/02/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2022; Received: 08/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 07/29/2022; Received: 07/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 07/29/2022; Received: 07/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED Amended Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 07/17/2022; Received: 07/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/13/2022; Received: 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 06/13/2022; Received: 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/10/2022; Received: 06/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Discovery Requests/Questions; Filed By: Waters, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 05/16/2022; Received: 05/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/07/2022; Received: 04/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Personal Service on Barreiro; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 12/07/2021; Received: 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Personal Service on Barbara Waters; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 12/07/2021; Received: 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2021; Received: 12/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Middleton, G.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIDDLETON, GINA MARIE