This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 21:51:49 (UTC).

THE SUMMIT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. JASON D. LILES

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 THE SUMMIT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JASON D LILES. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles N Zambito. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7196

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Charles N Zambito

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SUMMIT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Jason D Liles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMER, DEVIN LAWTON

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CONTRACT

EXHIBIT(S) - A CONTRACT; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B DEBTOR NOTICE

EXHIBIT(S) - B DEBTOR NOTICE; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C CONTRACT

EXHIBIT(S) - C CONTRACT; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEBTOR NOTICE

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEBTOR NOTICE; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

AFFIDAVIT Liles, J-Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Liles, J-Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT Liles, J-Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Liles, J-Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Order and Judgment

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Order and Judgment; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) In Support of Request for Default Judgment

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) In Support of Request for Default Judgment; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Non-Military Service

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Non-Military Service; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order awarding attorneys fees and default judgment

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order awarding attorneys fees and default judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order awarding attorneys fees and default judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Non-Military Service; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) In Support of Request for Default Judgment; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Order and Judgment; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Liles, J-Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Liles, J-Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D DEBTOR NOTICE; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C CONTRACT; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B DEBTOR NOTICE; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CONTRACT; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Palmer, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less