This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:23:30 (UTC).

The Sherwin-Williams Company - v. - Skilco Incorporated

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 The Sherwin-Williams Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Skilco Incorporated. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Sherwin-Williams Company

Defendant

Skilco Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONATO, STEPHANIE J

Attorney at STEPHANIE J. DONATO, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B statement of account

EXHIBIT(S) - B statement of account; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A credit application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A credit application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B statement of account

EXHIBIT(S) - B statement of account; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A credit application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A credit application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B statement of account; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A credit application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B statement of account; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A credit application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Donato, S.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less