This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 09/23/2021 at 10:02:33 (UTC).

The Sherwin-Wiliams Company v. John P. Cigal Sr., Individually and dba Industrial Corrosion Services et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 The Sherwin-Wiliams Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against John P Cigal Sr , Individually and dba Industrial Corrosion Services. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Sherwin-Wiliams Company

Defendants

John P. Cigal SR., INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA INDUSTRIAL CORROSION SERVICES

Statewide Aquastore, Inc.

Industrial Corrosion Services, Inc.

Hudson Insrance Company / Hudson Insurance Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGNARELLI, DAVID J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES - DAVID J. MAGNARELLI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) SIGNED NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) SIGNED NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 05/21/2021; Received: 05/21/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - CPLR 3215 - HUDSON INSURANCE COMAPNY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - CPLR 3215 - HUDSON INSURANCE COMAPNY; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/11/2021; Received: 02/11/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/04/2021; Received: 02/04/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF OF MAILING - STATEWIDE AQUASTORE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF OF MAILING - STATEWIDE AQUASTORE; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/02/2021; Received: 02/02/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF OF MAILING - INDUSTRIAL CORROSION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF OF MAILING - INDUSTRIAL CORROSION; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/02/2021; Received: 02/02/2021

ADMISSION OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE- STATEWIDE AQUASTORE INC

ADMISSION OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE- STATEWIDE AQUASTORE INC; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - INDUSTRIAL CORROSION SERVICE INC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - INDUSTRIAL CORROSION SERVICE INC; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - I BOND DISCHARGING LIEN

EXHIBIT(S) - I BOND DISCHARGING LIEN; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - H FILED MECHANIC LIEN

EXHIBIT(S) - H FILED MECHANIC LIEN; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - G STATEMENT ON ACCOUNT - LARGE ACCOUNT

EXHIBIT(S) - G STATEMENT ON ACCOUNT - LARGE ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - F CPLR 3016 SCHEDULE

EXHIBIT(S) - F CPLR 3016 SCHEDULE; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E INVOICES LARGE ACCOUNT

EXHIBIT(S) - E INVOICES LARGE ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D STATEMENT ON ACCOUNT

EXHIBIT(S) - D STATEMENT ON ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C CPLR 3016 SCHEDULE - SMALL ACCOUNT

EXHIBIT(S) - C CPLR 3016 SCHEDULE - SMALL ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B INVOICES - SMALL ACCOUNT

EXHIBIT(S) - B INVOICES - SMALL ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A CREDIT AGREEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A CREDIT AGREEMENT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) SIGNED NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 05/21/2021; Received: 05/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - CPLR 3215 - HUDSON INSURANCE COMAPNY; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/11/2021; Received: 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/04/2021; Received: 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF OF MAILING - STATEWIDE AQUASTORE; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/02/2021; Received: 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF OF MAILING - INDUSTRIAL CORROSION; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 02/02/2021; Received: 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE- STATEWIDE AQUASTORE INC; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - INDUSTRIAL CORROSION SERVICE INC; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I BOND DISCHARGING LIEN; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H FILED MECHANIC LIEN; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G STATEMENT ON ACCOUNT - LARGE ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F CPLR 3016 SCHEDULE; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E INVOICES LARGE ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D STATEMENT ON ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C CPLR 3016 SCHEDULE - SMALL ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B INVOICES - SMALL ACCOUNT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CREDIT AGREEMENT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Magnarelli, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less