Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 19:39:11 (UTC).

THE PINES AT UTICA CENTER FOR NURSING & REHABILITATION v. NICHOLAS TALARICO et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 THE PINES AT UTICA CENTER FOR NURSING REHABILITATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NICHOLAS TALARICO. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0512

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A/K/A UTICA CROSSINGS LLC D/B/A THE PINES AT UTICA

THE PINES AT UTICA CENTER FOR NURSING & REHABILITATION a/k/a UTICA CROSSINGS LLC d/b/a THE PINES AT UTICA

Defendants

June Talarico a/k/a LOUELLA TALARICO a/k/a LOUELLA POPE

A/K/A LOUELLA TALARICO A/K/A LOUELLA POPE

Nicholas Talarico

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERN, KENNETH MICHAEL

Attorney at GENSER DUBOW GENSER & CONA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JUNE TALARICO a/k/a LOUELLA TALARICO a/k/a LOUELLA POPE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JUNE TALARICO a/k/a LOUELLA TALARICO a/k/a LOUELLA POPE; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICHOLAS TALARICO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICHOLAS TALARICO; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JUNE TALARICO a/k/a LOUELLA TALARICO a/k/a LOUELLA POPE; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICHOLAS TALARICO; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less