This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 04:41:37 (UTC).

The New York State Health Facilities Association, Inc. et al v. Hon. Mark Poloncarz et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 The New York State Health Facilities Association, Inc filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against Hon Mark Poloncarz. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elderwood at Williamsville

Elderwood at Amherst

The New York State Health Facilities Association, Inc.

Schofield Residence

Elderwood at Hamburg

Williamsville Suburban Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing

Elderwood at Grand Island

Elderwood at Lancaster

Elderwood at Cheektowaga

Defendants

Hon. mark Poloncarz , as County Executive of County of Erie

David Shenk , as Commissioner of the Department of Senior Services of Erie County

Michael Siragusa , as County Attorney for the County of Erie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRAY, CORNELIUS D.

Attorney at O'CONNELL & ARONOWITZ, P.C.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - P Email from Plaintiff's counsel dated February 13, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - P Email from Plaintiff's counsel dated February 13, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - O Letter from defendant Commissioner Shenk dated February 11, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - O Letter from defendant Commissioner Shenk dated February 11, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - N Email from NYSHFA's attorney dated February 10, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - N Email from NYSHFA's attorney dated February 10, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - M Website listing posted by Erie County Dept of Senior Services

EXHIBIT(S) - M Website listing posted by Erie County Dept of Senior Services; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - L The Buffalo News Article

EXHIBIT(S) - L The Buffalo News Article; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K Letter from defendant Siragusa dated February 4, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K Letter from defendant Siragusa dated February 4, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J Letter from Erie County Legislator Lisa Chimera dated January 23, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J Letter from Erie County Legislator Lisa Chimera dated January 23, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I Legislators' Letter to defendant Poloncraz

EXHIBIT(S) - I Legislators' Letter to defendant Poloncraz; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H National Public Radio Report

EXHIBIT(S) - H National Public Radio Report; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G Letter from counsel for NYSHFA dated June 21, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G Letter from counsel for NYSHFA dated June 21, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F Letter from Commissioner Hogues dated June 8, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F Letter from Commissioner Hogues dated June 8, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Letter from NYSHFA and LeadingAge dated January 31, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E Letter from NYSHFA and LeadingAge dated January 31, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from Erie County Commissioner of Senior Services dated January 19, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from Erie County Commissioner of Senior Services dated January 19, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Joint Letter dated May 2, 2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Joint Letter dated May 2, 2017; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Executive Order No. 16 - Affirmation of Nursing Home Accountability

EXHIBIT(S) - B Executive Order No. 16 - Affirmation of Nursing Home Accountability; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ruthie's Law

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ruthie's Law; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P Email from Plaintiff's counsel dated February 13, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O Letter from defendant Commissioner Shenk dated February 11, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N Email from NYSHFA's attorney dated February 10, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M Website listing posted by Erie County Dept of Senior Services; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L The Buffalo News Article; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K Letter from defendant Siragusa dated February 4, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J Letter from Erie County Legislator Lisa Chimera dated January 23, 2020; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I Legislators' Letter to defendant Poloncraz; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H National Public Radio Report; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Letter from counsel for NYSHFA dated June 21, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Letter from Commissioner Hogues dated June 8, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Letter from NYSHFA and LeadingAge dated January 31, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from Erie County Commissioner of Senior Services dated January 19, 2018; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Joint Letter dated May 2, 2017; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Executive Order No. 16 - Affirmation of Nursing Home Accountability; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ruthie's Law; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Murray, C.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less