This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 22:04:21 (UTC).

The Long Island Home v. Robert Outcult

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 The Long Island Home filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Robert Outcult. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Long Island Home d/b/a Broadlawn Manor Nursing & Rehabilitation Center

Defendant

Robert Outcult

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINEVICH, SVETLANA

Attorney at Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Reply to Counterclaims

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Verified Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Minevich, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Minevich, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Reply to Counterclaims; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Minevich, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Minevich, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Minevich, S.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less