This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:34:27 (UTC).

THE CITY OF NEW YORK v. THE LAND AND BUILDING KNOWN AS 125 ISLINGTON STREET, TAX BLOCK 4604, TAX LOT 35, COUNTY of RICHMOND, CITY and STATE of NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 THE CITY OF NEW YORK filed an Other lawsuit against THE LAND AND BUILDING KNOWN AS 125 ISLINGTON STREET, TAX BLOCK 4604, TAX LOT 35, COUNTY of RICHMOND, CITY and STATE of NEW YORK. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim Dollard. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kim Dollard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Defendants

Jane Doe

John Doe

THE LAND AND BUILDING KNOWN AS 125 ISLINGTON STREET, TAX BLOCK 4604, TAX LOT 35, COUNTY of RICHMOND, CITY and STATE of NEW YORK

Barbara Mazzone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIANCOLA, ROBERT

Attorney at NYPD-LEGAL BUREAU

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED settlement of Douglas Mazzone

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED settlement of Douglas Mazzone; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) sign

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) sign; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Affidavit; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Invoices and Lab Reports Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Invoices and Lab Reports Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Affidavit; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Deed; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED settlement of Douglas Mazzone; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) sign; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Affidavit; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Invoices and Lab Reports Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Affidavit; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Deed; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Giancola, R.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less