This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:33:51 (UTC).

THE CITY OF NEW YORK HUMAN RESOURCES ADMINISTRATION - v. - JOHN KHOKHAR

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 THE CITY OF NEW YORK HUMAN RESOURCES ADMINISTRATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN KHOKHAR. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CITY OF NEW YORK HUMAN RESOURCES ADMINISTRATION

Defendant

John Khokhar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENE, GREGORY G.

Attorney at Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson, LLP

GONZALEZ, MARIA CRISTINA

Attorney at LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/7/20

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/7/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 1/7/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Greene, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less