This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:13:30 (UTC).

THE CITY OF NEW YORK HUMAN RESOURCES ADMINISTRATION - v. - IRENE TODD

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 THE CITY OF NEW YORK HUMAN RESOURCES ADMINISTRATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IRENE TODD. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CITY OF NEW YORK HUMAN RESOURCES ADMINISTRATION

Defendant

Irene Todd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCORD, SPENCER THOMAS

Attorney at Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

GONZALEZ, MARIA CRISTINA

Attorney at LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing in Compliance with CPLR 3215

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing in Compliance with CPLR 3215; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Process Server Costs

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Process Server Costs; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT Attorney Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment Entry

AFFIDAVIT Attorney Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment Entry; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Process Server Costs; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing in Compliance with CPLR 3215; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Attorney Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment Entry; Filed By: Mccord, S.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gonzalez, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less