Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 03:35:38 (UTC).

The Board of Managers of Twenty 9th Park Madison - v. - East 29th Street LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 The Board of Managers of Twenty 9th Park Madison filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against East 29th Street LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter Sherwood. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Peter Sherwood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Board of Managers of Twenty 9th Park Madison

Defendants

H. Thomas O'Hara, Architect, PLLC

East 29th Street LLC

John Doe

Rafael De gispert

Gotham Greenwich Construction Company, LLC

Robert Derector, P.E., P.C.

Salvador grane Terradas

Johb Doe

Richard san jose Sorroche

Landscape Espais, S.L.

Josep santamans Portabella

Espais Promocions Immobiliaries E.P.I., S.A.

Orion Mechanical Systems, Inc.

39-45 East 29th Street Corp.

Luis casamitjana Serraclara

Landscape Promocions Immobiliaries, S.L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMORELLO, KENNETH H

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SIMONIAN, MARYANEH M

Attorney at PRYOR CASHMAN LLP

COOPERMAN, LAUREN BETH

Attorney at PRYOR CASHMAN LLP

SOLOWAY, TODD E

Attorney at PRYOR CASHMAN LLP

BECKERMAN, JASON L

Attorney at ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN & BENTLEY

AHERN, NANCY ELLEN

Attorney at Parmet & Zhou LLC

CURRY, JUDI L

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

MAJOR, ANDRE JUSTIN

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

OLIVIERO, JAMES F

BROGAN, KELLEY MARIE

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH, MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of June 4, 2019 Order (with copy of order and transcript)

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of June 4, 2019 Order (with copy of order and transcript); Filed By: Major, A.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Cooperman, L.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Transcript of 5.14.2019 Hearing Enclosed

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Transcript of 5.14.2019 Hearing Enclosed; Filed By: Cooperman, L.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A CPLR 3215(g)(4) Notice To H. Thomas O'Hara Architect, PLLC

EXHIBIT(S) - A CPLR 3215(g)(4) Notice To H. Thomas O'Hara Architect, PLLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/19/2018; Received: 11/19/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; Filed By: Simonian, M.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Gotham Greenwich Construction Company, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Gotham Greenwich Construction Company, LLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service H. Thomas O'Hara, Architect, PLLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service H. Thomas O'Hara, Architect, PLLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service East 29th Street LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service East 29th Street LLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Orion Mechanical Systems, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Orion Mechanical Systems, Inc.; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Robert Derector P.E., P.C.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Robert Derector P.E., P.C.; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 39045 East 29th Street Corp.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 39045 East 29th Street Corp.; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of June 4, 2019 Order (with copy of order and transcript); Filed By: Major, A.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Cooperman, L.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Transcript of 5.14.2019 Hearing Enclosed; Filed By: Cooperman, L.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CPLR 3215(g)(4) Notice To H. Thomas O'Hara Architect, PLLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/19/2018; Received: 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of CPLR 3215(g)(4) Notice; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/19/2018; Received: 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; Filed By: Simonian, M.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Gotham Greenwich Construction Company, LLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service H. Thomas O'Hara, Architect, PLLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service East 29th Street LLC; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Orion Mechanical Systems, Inc.; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Robert Derector P.E., P.C.; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 39045 East 29th Street Corp.; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Amorello, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less