Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 02:53:37 (UTC).

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS v. LI BUILDERS CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LI BUILDERS CORP. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Francis A Kahn Iii. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Francis A Kahn Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS

Defendants

LI BUILDERS CORP.

JOHN DOE No. 1 through JOHN DOE No. 15

ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLAND, ROBERT T

Attorney at BELKIN BURDEN GOLDMAN, LLP

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail - EXHIBITS - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holl ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail - EXHIBITS - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holl ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 EXHIBIT 2 ((Proposed) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale) - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S M ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 EXHIBIT 2 ((Proposed) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale) - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S M ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 EXHIBIT 1 ((Proposed) Money Judgment) - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Hollan ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 EXHIBIT 1 ((Proposed) Money Judgment) - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Hollan ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A-J EXHIBITS A-J: Ex. A - Lien; Ex. B - Sum & Complt; Ex. C - Notice of Pendency; Ex. D ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - A-J EXHIBITS A-J: Ex. A - Lien; Ex. B - Sum & Complt; Ex. C - Notice of Pendency; Ex. D ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Rober ... show more

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Rober ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on March 16, 2020

NOTICE OF MOTION Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on March 16, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Robe ... show more

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Robe ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on January 17, 2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on January 17, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of CPLR 3215 notice

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of CPLR 3215 notice; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS CPLR 3215 Notice

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS CPLR 3215 Notice; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UO; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended AOS of S&C on ECB

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended AOS of S&C on ECB; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ECB

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ECB; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with EXHIBIT A - Descri ... show more

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with EXHIBIT A - Descri ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with Verific ... show more

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with Verific ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service by Mail - EXHIBITS - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on March 16, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 2 ((Proposed) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale) - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on March 16, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 1 ((Proposed) Money Judgment) - AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on March 16, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-J (Motion #002) EXHIBITS A-J: Ex. A - Lien; Ex. B - Sum & Complt; Ex. C - Notice of Pendency; Ex. D - AOS of Sum & Complt; Ex. E - CPLR 3215 Notice; Ex. F - 2/11/20 Decision granting Default Judgments; Ex. G - Letter to Referee; Ex. H -; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on March 16, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on March 16, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of hard copy of CPLR 8019 notice; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-G (Motion #001) EXHIBITS A - G: Ex. A - Lien; Ex. B - Referees deed; Ex. C - Summons & Complaint; Ex. D - Lis Pendens; Ex. E - AOS of Summons & Complaint; Ex. F - CPLR 3215 Notice and AOS AND Ex. G - Ledger for arrears; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (by Holland, Esq.) - Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on January 17, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on January 17, 2020; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of CPLR 3215 notice; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PLEADINGS CPLR 3215 Notice; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UO; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended AOS of S&C on ECB; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ECB; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with EXHIBIT A - Description of Liened Premises; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with Verification by Timothy O'Keefe - Assistant Secretary of the BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS - the Plaintiff in this action and EXHIBIT A - Details; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less