Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 02:53:32 (UTC).

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS et al v. SEVDA U. IMRANOVA et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SEVDA U IMRANOVA. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Francis A Kahn Iii. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Francis A Kahn Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE RESIDENTIAL BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS

Defendants

STOCKS2CASH LLC

CITIBANK, N.A.

James Walton

JOHN DOE No. 1 through JOHN DOE No. 15

Katy Ferrara

LIFTFORWARD INC.

Sevda U. Imranova

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLLAND, ROBERT T

Attorney at BELKIN BURDEN GOLDMAN, LLP

SIMANCA-PROCTOR, CHRISTINA

Attorney at BELKIN BURDEN WENIG & GOLDMAN, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH, JORDAN M

Attorney at AKERMAN SENTERFITT, LLP

HALKIAS, WILLIAM J.

Attorney at Houser LLP

CANIZARES, STEFAN MANUEL

Attorney at Akerman LLP

FAJARDO, EDUARDO A

Attorney at DE LOTTO & FAJARDO, LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

deed, lien, by-laws

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

O'Keefe Affidavit

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Fajardo, E.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE liftforward

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE liftforward; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Taylor, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Taylor, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Canizares, S.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Tenant

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Tenant; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Defendant Citibank, N.A.

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Defendant Citibank, N.A.; Filed By: Smith, J.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE her

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE her; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE him

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE him; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE As AOS on SUI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE As AOS on SUI; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with EXHIBIT A - Legal ... show more

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with EXHIBIT A - Legal ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with Verific ... show more

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with Verific ... show more; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Simanca-Proctor, C.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-O (Motion #001) deed, lien, by-laws; Filed By: Simanca-Proctor, C.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Simanca-Proctor, C.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) O'Keefe Affidavit; Filed By: Simanca-Proctor, C.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Simanca-Proctor, C.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Fajardo, E.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE liftforward; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Taylor, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Taylor, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Canizares, S.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Tenant; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Defendant Citibank, N.A.; Filed By: Smith, J.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE her; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE him; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE As AOS on SUI; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with EXHIBIT A - Legal Description of Liened Premises; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint prepared by Robert T. Holland, Esq. on November 11, 2019 with Verification by Timothy O'Keefe - Assistant Secretary of the BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE FIVE NINE JOHN LOFTS - One of the Plaintiffs in this action; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less