This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 09:21:57 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR C-BASS MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2004-CB2 v. SHAUN M. WILCOX et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR C-BASS MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2004-CB2 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHAUN M WILCOX. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0381

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR C-BASS MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2004-CB2

Defendants

Shaun M. Wilcox

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #12, the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Subje

LUCILLE A. SOLDATO, ACTING COMMISSIONER, ONEIDA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES, OR HER SUCCESSOR IN OFFICE

ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 SHAUN M. WILCOX

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 SHAUN M. WILCOX; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SHAUN M. WILCOX

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SHAUN M. WILCOX; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS LUCILLE A. SOLDATO, AG CMMR, ONEIDA COUNTY DEPT OF SOCIAL SERVICES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS LUCILLE A. SOLDATO, AG CMMR, ONEIDA COUNTY DEPT OF SOCIAL SERVICES; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANT MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VACANCY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VACANCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 SHAUN M. WILCOX; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SHAUN M. WILCOX; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS LUCILLE A. SOLDATO, AG CMMR, ONEIDA COUNTY DEPT OF SOCIAL SERVICES; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VACANCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less