This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 16:57:12 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR NATIONSTAR HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2009-A - v. - NORMALYN TROUTH et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR NATIONSTAR HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2009-A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NORMALYN TROUTH. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR NATIONSTAR HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2009-A

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF WOODLAND HILLS CONDOMINIUM

John Doe

Normalyn Trouth

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CENTEX HOME EQUITY COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

BUSSI, NICHOLAS C.

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

ZEBROWSKI, KATHLEEN A

Attorney at U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U S ATTORNEYS OFFICE

LAGUMINA, JOHN J

Attorney at THE LAGUMINA LAW FIRM PLLC

SPIVAK, LAWRENCE G.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE SPIVAK

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) A copy of the re-filed Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) A copy of the re-filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) A copy of any Notice(s) of Appearance and/or Answer(s)

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) A copy of any Notice(s) of Appearance and/or Answer(s); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lagumina, J.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOM OF WOODLAND HILLS CONDOMINIUM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOM OF WOODLAND HILLS CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bussi, N.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CENTEX HOME EQUITY COMPANY, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CENTEX HOME EQUITY COMPANY, LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) A copy of the re-filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) A copy of any Notice(s) of Appearance and/or Answer(s); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2018; Received: 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lagumina, J.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lagumina, J.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOM OF WOODLAND HILLS CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bussi, N.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CENTEX HOME EQUITY COMPANY, LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less