This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 19:50:32 (UTC).

Terry L. Towner et al v. Alan Trenchard et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Terry L Towner filed an Other lawsuit against Alan Trenchard. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********83CV

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Living Trust Towner

Defendants

Alan Trenchard

Mark S Ostrander

Betty J Margeson

Cynthia Ostrander

Michael S Margeson

Robert L Davis

Clifford Margeson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, SCOTT D.

Attorney at SCOTT D. MOORE LAW OFFICE, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

ARGENTIERI, PAUL ANTHONY

Attorney at PAUL A ARGENTIERI

BAKER, PETER HARRISON

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Argentieri, P.; Filed: 09/22/2019; Received: 09/22/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply to Petition and poa for Cliffard Margeson

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply to Petition and poa for Cliffard Margeson; Filed By: Baker, P.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #1)

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #1); Filed By: Argentieri, P.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Michael Margeson

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Michael Margeson; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Mark Ostrander

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Mark Ostrander; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Betty Jean Margeson

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Betty Jean Margeson; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Clifford Margeson

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Clifford Margeson; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

PETITION Article 78 Petition

PETITION Article 78 Petition; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Argentieri, P.; Filed: 09/22/2019; Received: 09/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply to Petition and poa for Cliffard Margeson; Filed By: Baker, P.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #1); Filed By: Argentieri, P.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Michael Margeson; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Mark Ostrander; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Betty Jean Margeson; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Clifford Margeson; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Cynthia Ostrander; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Article 78 Petition; Filed By: Moore, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less