Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/11/2021 at 02:59:16 (UTC).

Teri A. DeBruyne et al v. CCS MEDICAL, PLLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Teri A DeBruyne filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CCS MEDICAL, PLLC. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick J Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frederick J Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stacy L. Gold as Co-Executor of the Estate of MARILYN S. BARKLEY

Teri A. Debruyne as Co-Executor of the Estate of MARILYN S. BARKLEY

Defendants

CCS MEDICAL, PLLC

Jeffrey Neu

CCS Medical PLLC d/b/a CCS Healthcare

Nancy Peters MD

Associated Physicians of Western New York, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAHEY, COLLEEN

Attorney at Brown Chiari LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LOSS, JOHN TIMOTHY

Attorney at CONNORS LLP

WATSON, CRAIG RANDALL

Attorney at GIBSON MCASKILL & CROSBY, LLP

SWEET, KATHLEEN MARIE

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

Consolidate w/Index #818837/2018

STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

E-mails and letter in companion case

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendant's Medicare/Medicaid Demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendant's Omnibus Demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendant's BOP Demand

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/18/2020; Received: 01/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order of Hon. Michael J. Kaplan, USBJ (Lifting Stay)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order of Hon. Michael J. Kaplan, USBJ (Lifting Stay); Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Consolidate w/Index #818837/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/19/2021; Received: 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 11/20/2020; Received: 11/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) E-mails and letter in companion case; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Defendant's Medicare/Medicaid Demands; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Defendant's Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Defendant's BOP Demand; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 07/17/2020; Received: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Seved by Defendant to Plaintiffs; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/18/2020; Received: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Order of Hon. Michael J. Kaplan, USBJ (Lifting Stay); Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Fahey, C. - filed by Brown Chiari LLP; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less