This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 18:52:57 (UTC).

TERESA CAPELLAN v. MELISSA K. FREY M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 TERESA CAPELLAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MELISSA K FREY M D. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is George J. Silver - Gjs6. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

George J. Silver - Gjs6

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa Capellan

Defendants

Melissa K. Frey M.D.

NEW YORK PRESBYTERIAN/WEILL CORNELL MEDICAL CENTER

Jane Doe M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARRIS, SETH A

Attorney at Burns & Harris

LAROCCA, STEPHEN

Attorney at Burns & Harris

KEENAN, ALISON ROSE

Attorney at BURNS & HARRIS

Defendant Attorneys

SHAPIRO, LAURA R.

Attorney at McAloon & Friedman PC

GOLDSTEIN, LISA BETH

Attorney at MCALOON & FRIEDMAN, PC

MOORE, MADELINE MARIE

Attorney at McAloon & Friedman

ROSENTHAL, CLARKE ELIZABETH

Attorney at McAloon & Friedman, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER DATED: OCTOBER 30, 2019

ORDER - OTHER DATED: OCTOBER 30, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated: 09/04/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated: 09/04/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer for Melissa K. Frey, M.D.

ANSWER Verified Answer for Melissa K. Frey, M.D.; Filed By: Shapiro, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer on behalf of New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital

ANSWER Verified Answer on behalf of New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital; Filed By: Shapiro, L.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Larocca, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Electronic Filing

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER DATED: OCTOBER 30, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated: 09/04/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer for Melissa K. Frey, M.D.; Filed By: Shapiro, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer on behalf of New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital; Filed By: Shapiro, L.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Larocca, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less