Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/14/2020 at 23:13:28 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. v. SHARON D MARTIN

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHARON D MARTIN. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

Sharon D Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 10, 2020

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 10, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C CLIENT STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - C CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS & CONDITIONS

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS & CONDITIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF

EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 10, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS & CONDITIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less