This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 18:51:31 (UTC).

TD BANK, N.A. - v. - ANGAAD SOOKNANDAN

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 TD BANK, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANGAAD SOOKNANDAN. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK, N.A. a/a/o COMMERCE BANK, N.A.

Defendant

Angaad Sooknandan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LEE, SEUNG WOO

Attorney at Lester & Associates, P.C.

KAMRAN, PETER K

Attorney at Lester & Associates, P.C.

DRUMMOND, ROBERT ANDREW

Attorney at The Law Offices of Martyn and Martyn

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

Note of Issue

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

Seq. Nos. 001 and 002

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Mailing

EXHIBIT(S)

Amended Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendant's Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Defendant Sooknandan

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION

Affirmation in Opposition to Motion and in Support Cross Motion

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION

Notice of Cross Motion

EXHIBIT(S)

Promissory Note

EXHIBIT(S)

NY Secretary of State Corporation Information

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ANSWER

Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Guarantee

EXHIBIT(S)

Promissory Note

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note of Issue; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Seq. Nos. 001 and 002; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Amended Answer; Filed By: Lee, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Lee, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Lee, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Defendant Sooknandan; Filed By: Lee, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Affirmation in Opposition to Motion and in Support Cross Motion; Filed By: Lee, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Cross Motion; Filed By: Lee, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Unconditional Guarantee; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Promissory Note; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NY Secretary of State Corporation Information; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Drummond, R.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Guarantee; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Promissory Note; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less