This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 06/28/2020 at 07:03:54 (UTC).

TD BANK, N.A., formerly known as TD Banknorth, N.A. - v. - PATTERSON CROSSING REALTY COMPANY, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 TD BANK, N A , formerly known as TD Banknorth, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PATTERSON CROSSING REALTY COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK, N.A., formerly known as TD Banknorth, N.A.

Defendants

PATTERSON CROSSING REALTY COMPANY, LLC

JOHN DOE 1 to JOHN DOE 25, said names being fictitious, the persons or parties intended being the persons, parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the mortgaged premises described in the complaint

Paul A. Camarda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRANTZ, DAVID B

HOLMES, ERIC

Defendant Attorneys

LUSARDI, ROBERT C.

MILLER, JEFFREY A

PLANELL, MICHAEL E

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Auction Mortgaged Premises

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Auction Mortgaged Premises; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 05/11/2020; Received: 05/11/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 05/11/2020; Received: 05/11/2020

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

Stipulation and Order for the Withdrawal of Verified Answer with Counterclaim and Entry of Judgment on Consent

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Exhibit 7 - 2010 Loan Modification

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Exhibit 7 - 2010 Loan Modification; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit 6 - First Loan Modification

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit 6 - First Loan Modification; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 - Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 - Mortgage; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 - Guaranty

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 - Guaranty; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 - Loan Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 - Loan Agreement; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Note

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Note; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit 1 - Legal Descriptions

EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit 1 - Legal Descriptions; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/11/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/11/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Auction Mortgaged Premises; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 05/11/2020; Received: 05/11/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 05/11/2020; Received: 05/11/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation and Order for the Withdrawal of Verified Answer with Counterclaim and Entry of Judgment on Consent; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Grantz, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
135 More Docket Entries
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 Exhibit 8 - Second Loan Modification; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 Exhibit 7 - 2010 Loan Modification; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit 6 - First Loan Modification; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 - Mortgage; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 - Guaranty; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 - Loan Agreement; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Note; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) Exhibit 1 - Legal Descriptions; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/11/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Holmes, E.; Filed: 04/11/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less