Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 12:38:14 (UTC).

TD Auto Finance LLC v. Barbara Denny et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 TD Auto Finance LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Barbara Denny. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Auto Finance LLC

Defendants

Barbara Denny

Briana Denny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM SFO RFQ 2/18/20

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM SFO RFQ 2/18/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER Attorney's Fees

RJI -RE: OTHER Attorney's Fees; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of non-military

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of non-military; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Attorney Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Attorney Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order for Attorney Fees

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order for Attorney Fees; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BRIANA DENNY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BRIANA DENNY; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BARBARA DENNY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BARBARA DENNY; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM SFO RFQ 2/18/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Attorney's Fees; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of non-military; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Attorney Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order for Attorney Fees; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BRIANA DENNY; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BARBARA DENNY; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less